IA SJR1 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa to dedicate a portion of state revenue from the tax imposed on certain retail sales of tangible personal property and services for the benefit of the state's natural resources.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa to dedicate a portion of state revenue from the tax imposed on certain retail sales of tangible personal property and services for the benefit of the state's natural resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-02-18 | Withdrawn. S.J. 325. | |
2009-02-18 | HJR 1 substituted. S.J. 323. | |
2009-01-21 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 113. | |
2009-01-14 | Subcommittee, Dearden, Black, and Hahn. S.J. 83. | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. S.J. 82. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SJR&key=0016B&ga=83 |