IA SF97 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to low-speed electric bicycles, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to low-speed electric bicycles, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 8:30AM 24A. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Giddens, and Rozenboom. S.J. 130. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 119. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB80 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 335.
HF493 (Similar To) 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209.
HF493 (Similar To) 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF97 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF97.html |