IA SF9 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 247. S.J. 299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to supplemental aid and modified supplemental amounts for certain school districts relating to open enrollment and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 247.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to supplemental aid and modified supplemental amounts for certain school districts relating to open enrollment and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 247.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-08SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 247. S.J. 299.
2023-01-25SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-01-19SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2023 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
2023-01-11SenateSubcommittee: Zaun, Celsi, and Cournoyer. S.J. 101.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduced, referred to Education. S.J. 44.

Same As/Similar To

SF247 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback