IA SF86 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to continuity of care and nonmedical switching by health carriers, health benefit plans, and utilization review organizations, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to continuity of care and nonmedical switching by health carriers, health benefit plans, and utilization review organizations, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2023 11:00AM Room G15. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Bisignano, and Westrich. S.J. 144. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. S.J. 140. |
Same As/Similar To
HF96 (Similar To) 2023-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 596.
HF626 (Similar To) 2024-05-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 935.
HF626 (Similar To) 2024-05-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 935.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF86 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF86.html |