IA SF77 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act abolishing county compensation boards.
Title
A bill for an act abolishing county compensation boards.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 8:00AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Klimesh, and J. Smith. S.J. 122. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. S.J. 95. |
Same As/Similar To
HF125 (Similar To) 2021-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF77 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF77.html |