IA SF75 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the interception of communications and civil damages, civil and criminal immunity, and injunctive relief.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the interception of communications and civil damages, civil and criminal immunity, and injunctive relief.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2021 12:30PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Kinney, and J. Taylor. S.J. 112. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 95. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF75 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF75.html |