IA SF69 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 8:00AM RM 24A.
Pending: Senate Labor and Business Relations Committee
Hearing: Jan 26 @ 8:00 am Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act requiring that contractors provide information about persons performing construction work on certain public improvement projects to the labor commissioner, making penalties applicable, and including applicability provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act requiring that contractors provide information about persons performing construction work on certain public improvement projects to the labor commissioner, making penalties applicable, and including applicability provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 8:00AM RM 24A.
2021-01-13SenateSubcommittee: Brown, J. Taylor, and T. Taylor. S.J. 98.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Labor and Business Relations. S.J. 73.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback