IA SF68 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 570. S.J. 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 570. S.J. 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to immunity from civil liability for disaster response by volunteers who enter upon or in private property without express consent of the owner, lessee, or person in lawful possession. (See SF 570.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to immunity from civil liability for disaster response by volunteers who enter upon or in private property without express consent of the owner, lessee, or person in lawful possession. (See SF 570.)
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Edler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 570. S.J. 525. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Chapman, and Hogg. S.J. 147. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 122. |
Same As/Similar To
SF570 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF68 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF68.html |