IA SF633 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 1048.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 1048.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of certain subdivided real property and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1150.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of certain subdivided real property and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1150.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 1048. |
2019-04-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1046. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1151. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1149. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1022. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 1020. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1150 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.