IA SF62 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 303. S.J. 346.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 303. S.J. 346.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the expiration of a person's driver's license or nonoperator's identification card on the person's twenty-first birthday anniversary, and including applicability provisions. (See SF 303.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the expiration of a person's driver's license or nonoperator's identification card on the person's twenty-first birthday anniversary, and including applicability provisions. (See SF 303.)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Dawson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 303. S.J. 346. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Breitbach, and Kinney. S.J. 158. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 108. |
Same As/Similar To
SF303 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1195.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF62 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF62.html |