IA SF613 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-27 - Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1191.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the established season for hunting game birds on a preserve, and providing for fees. (Formerly SSB 1248.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the established season for hunting game birds on a preserve, and providing for fees. (Formerly SSB 1248.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-27SenateReferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1191.
2019-04-03SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 851.
2019-04-03SenateIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 847.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1248 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/27/2019 3:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback