IA SF610 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1028.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1028.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the mandatory disclosure of whether a person has received a vaccination for COVID-19, disqualifying certain entities from receiving state grants or contracts, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the mandatory disclosure of whether a person has received a vaccination for COVID-19, disqualifying certain entities from receiving state grants or contracts, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 1028. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | HF 889 substituted. S.J. 1027. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 889. S.J. 1020. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 961. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/27/2021 8:30AM RM 24A. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Bisignano, and Williams. S.J. 956. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. S.J. 955. |
Same As/Similar To
HF889 (Similar To) 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1212.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF610 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF610.html |