IA SF61 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 185. S.J. 237.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle registration fees for disabled veterans. (See SF 185.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle registration fees for disabled veterans. (See SF 185.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 185. S.J. 237.
2019-01-23SenateSubcommittee: Shipley, Cournoyer, and Lykam. S.J. 158.
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 108.

Same As/Similar To

SF185 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Costello, Giddens, and Koelker. S.J. 85.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback