IA SF604 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying the sales tax holiday to include emergency preparedness supplies.(Formerly SSB 1240.)
Title
A bill for an act modifying the sales tax holiday to include emergency preparedness supplies.(Formerly SSB 1240.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2022 3:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Goodwin, and Quirmbach. S.J. 120. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1148. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 937. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 934. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1240 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as [].