IA SF599 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to hemp, including the regulation of hemp, providing for enforcement and the confiscation and destruction or disposal of certain property, providing for fees, including penalties, and providing implementation and effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 279.) Various effective dates; see sections 19 and 33 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to hemp, including the regulation of hemp, providing for enforcement and the confiscation and destruction or disposal of certain property, providing for fees, including penalties, and providing implementation and effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 279.) Various effective dates; see sections 19 and 33 of bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197. |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1194. |
2019-04-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1003. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1106. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 1. S.J. 1105. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3211. S.J. 1105. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3211. S.J. 1079. |
2019-04-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 979. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1012. |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 95 nays 3. H.J. 960. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1285 filed, adopted. H.J. 959. |
2019-04-23 | House | Substituted for HF 781. H.J. 959. |
2019-04-19 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 927. |
2019-04-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 847. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 953. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 1. S.J. 952. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment S-3160 filed, adopted. S.J. 952. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 711. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 709. |
Same As/Similar To
SF279 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 599. S.J. 711.
HF763 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 753.
HF763 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 753.