IA SF593 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee: Goodwin, Petersen, and Sinclair. S.J. 120.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee: Goodwin, Petersen, and Sinclair. S.J. 120.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of fees when a public defender or designee requests copies of certain documents.(Formerly SF 560, SF 51.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of fees when a public defender or designee requests copies of certain documents.(Formerly SF 560, SF 51.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Goodwin, Petersen, and Sinclair. S.J. 120. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1148. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 842. S.J. 799. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 769. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 767. |
Same As/Similar To
SF51 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 560. S.J. 525.
HF57 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 854.
HF545 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 854.
SF560 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 593. S.J. 769.
HF842 (Similar To) 2022-04-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF57 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 854.
HF545 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 854.
SF560 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 593. S.J. 769.
HF842 (Similar To) 2022-04-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.