IA SF583 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 614.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 614.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to billing methods that may be utilized in connection with distributed generation facilities. (Formerly SSB 1201.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to billing methods that may be utilized in connection with distributed generation facilities. (Formerly SSB 1201.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 614. |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 614. |
2020-03-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 450. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 515. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 515. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5052. S.J. 514. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5052. S.J. 497. |
2020-03-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 427. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 532. |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 98, nays none. H.J. 422. |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee amendment H-8033 adopted, as amended. H.J. 422. |
2020-03-03 | House | Amendment H-8058 to H-8033 filed, adopted. H.J. 421. |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed on calendar H.J. 369. |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee amendment H-8033 filed. H.J. 369. |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 369. |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2020 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee: Carlson, Forbes and Mitchell. H.J. 293. |
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Commerce. H.J. 1077. |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 569. |
2019-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 568. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 28, nays 19. S.J. 653. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 654. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3034 lost. S.J. 653. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3040 filed, adopted. S.J. 652. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3038 filed, lost. S.J. 651. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3041 filed, lost. S.J. 651. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3039 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 651. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 646. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Amendment S-3034 filed. S.J. 620. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 547. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 544. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB185 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 403.
SSB1201 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF669 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 1076.
SSB1201 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF669 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 1076.