IA SF582 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Schultz, T. Taylor, and Whiting. S.J. 88.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Schultz, T. Taylor, and Whiting. S.J. 88.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of barbering and cosmetology arts and sciences and providing transition provisions. (Formerly SF 418.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of barbering and cosmetology arts and sciences and providing transition provisions. (Formerly SF 418.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, T. Taylor, and Whiting. S.J. 88. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 1191. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 858. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 530. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 520. |
Same As/Similar To
SF418 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 582. S.J. 530.
HSB231 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 470.
HF695 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to State Government. H.J. 1076.
HSB231 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 470.
HF695 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to State Government. H.J. 1076.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF582 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF582.html |