IA SF573 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 621.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 621.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the frequency of meetings of a committee created to establish the minimum rate to be earned on state funds placed in time deposits.(Formerly SF 405.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the frequency of meetings of a committee created to establish the minimum rate to be earned on state funds placed in time deposits.(Formerly SF 405.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 621. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 265. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2022 10:30AM Room 15 (legislative dining room) starting 9:30 a.m.. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Goodwin, Celsi, and R. Smith. S.J. 110. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 726. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 570. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 569. |
Same As/Similar To
SF405 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Subcommittee reassigned: Goodwin, Celsi, and R. Smith. S.J. 80.
HF690 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
HF690 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.