IA SF573 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Chapman, Bisignano, and R. Smith. S.J. 87.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Chapman, Bisignano, and R. Smith. S.J. 87.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the appropriation and expenditure of funds for lobbying activities by governmental entities, and providing a penalty. (Formerly SSB 1229.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the appropriation and expenditure of funds for lobbying activities by governmental entities, and providing a penalty. (Formerly SSB 1229.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Bisignano, and R. Smith. S.J. 87. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 859. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 528. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 519. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1229 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF573 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF573.html |