IA SF570 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for immunity from civil liability for licensed architects and professional engineers providing disaster emergency assistance under specified circumstances and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 68.) Effective 5-10-19.
Title
A bill for an act providing for immunity from civil liability for licensed architects and professional engineers providing disaster emergency assistance under specified circumstances and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 68.) Effective 5-10-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196. |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 962. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1066. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 1. S.J. 1065. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3189. S.J. 1065. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3189. S.J. 1025. |
2019-04-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 922. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1013. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1012. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed House, yeas 96 nays none. H.J. 916. |
2019-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1183 adopted. H.J. 916. |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1183 filed. H.J. 797. |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 739. |
2019-04-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-04-01 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, Gustafson and Sunde. H.J. 708. |
2019-04-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/02/2019 4:00PM House Lounge. |
2019-03-29 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 693. |
2019-03-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 689. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 786. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 783. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Amendments S-3054 and S-3057 out of order. S.J. 783. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3088 filed, adopted. S.J. 783. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Amendments S-3054 and S-3057 filed. S.J. 696. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 525. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 518. |
Same As/Similar To
SF68 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 570. S.J. 525.