IA SF569 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to business entities, by providing for different types of limited liability companies and the dissolution of limited liability companies, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1199.) Various effective dates; see sections 41 and 53 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to business entities, by providing for different types of limited liability companies and the dissolution of limited liability companies, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1199.) Various effective dates; see sections 41 and 53 of bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 949. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 949. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 855. |
2019-04-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 736. |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 99, nays none. H.J. 731. |
2019-04-03 | House | Substituted for HF 723. H.J. 731. |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 650. |
2019-03-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 648. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 741. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 740. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 525. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 518. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1199 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB209 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 420.
HF723 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
HSB209 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 420.
HF723 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.