IA SF568 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the conduct of elections, including nominations, procedures for proposed amendments to the Iowa Constitution, and absentee voting, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1237.) Effective date: Enactment, 01/01/2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the conduct of elections, including nominations, procedures for proposed amendments to the Iowa Constitution, and absentee voting, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1237.) Effective date: Enactment, 01/01/2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Shall the motion to concur be adopted? (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Shall amendment H–1534 be adopted? (Y: 34 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - Shall amendment H–1533 be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08HouseSigned by Governor. S.J. 1150.
2021-06-03HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1149.
2021-06-22HouseSecretary's report on correction in enrollment. S.J. 1154.
2021-05-19HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1199.
2021-05-19SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1135.
2021-06-22SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 1149.
2021-05-19SenatePassed Senate, yeas 29, nays 17. S.J. 1134.
2021-05-19SenateSenate concurred with S-3243. S.J. 1134.
2021-05-19SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-3243. S.J. 1130.
2021-05-19HouseImmediate message. H.J. 1193.
2021-05-19HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1207.
2021-05-19HouseExplanations of votes. H.J. 1206.
2021-05-19HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1205.
2021-05-19HousePassed House, yeas 54, nays 33. H.J. 1185.
2021-05-19HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1207.
2021-05-19HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1206.
2021-05-19HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1205.
2021-05-19HouseAmendment H-1533 lost. H.J. 1184.
2021-05-19HouseAmendment H-1533 filed. H.J. 1183.
2021-05-19HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1207.
2021-05-19HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1206.
2021-05-19HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1205.
2021-05-19HouseAmendment H-1534 lost. H.J. 1183.
2021-05-19HouseAmendment H-1534 filed. H.J. 1182.
2021-05-19HouseAmendment H-1364 withdrawn. H.J. 1182.
2021-05-19HouseAmendment H-1535 filed, adopted. H.J. 1182.
2021-04-08HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 920.
2021-04-07HouseAmendment H-1364 filed. H.J. 917.
2021-03-31HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 875.
2021-03-29HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/30/2021 1:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
2021-03-29HouseFiscal note.
2021-03-25HouseSubcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale and Hunter. H.J. 855.
2021-03-24HouseRead first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 780.
2021-03-17HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 743.
2021-03-17SenateImmediate message. S.J. 632.
2021-03-17SenatePassed Senate, yeas 30, nays 17. S.J. 631.
2021-03-17SenateAmendment S-3076 filed, adopted. S.J. 631.
2021-03-10SenateFiscal note.
2021-03-08SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 553.
2021-03-08SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 550.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1237 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 568.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF568
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF568.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGR/89/attachments/SF568.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGE/89/attachments/SF568.html
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1216215.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1218239.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210308_SJNL.pdf#553
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210317_SJNL.pdf#631
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210519_HJNL.pdf#1182
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210519_HJNL.pdf#1181
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210519_HJNL.pdf#1183
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210519_SJNL.pdf#1134

Bill Comments

feedback