IA SF565 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1088.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1088.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state and local finance and the administration of the tax and related laws by the department of revenue, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1148.) Effective date: 06/01/2023, 07/01/2023, 01/01/2024, 01/01/2026. Applicability date: 01/01/2023, 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to state and local finance and the administration of the tax and related laws by the department of revenue, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1148.) Effective date: 06/01/2023, 07/01/2023, 01/01/2024, 01/01/2026. Applicability date: 01/01/2023, 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1088. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1006. |
2023-05-01 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 950. |
2023-05-03 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 1014. |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 942. |
2023-05-01 | House | Substituted for HF 715. H.J. 942. |
2023-04-25 | House | Fiscal note. |
2023-04-24 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 904. |
2023-04-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 903. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 915. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 912. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3170 filed, adopted. S.J. 912. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 747. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 747. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1148 (Related) 2023-04-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 565.
HSB187 (Related) 2023-04-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 715.
HF715 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 951.
HSB187 (Related) 2023-04-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 715.
HF715 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 951.