IA SF564 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-22 - Referred to Commerce. S.J. 1148.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-22 - Referred to Commerce. S.J. 1148.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for actions taken by a board of directors of a corporation without a meeting.(Formerly SSB 1216.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for actions taken by a board of directors of a corporation without a meeting.(Formerly SSB 1216.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | Senate | Referred to Commerce. S.J. 1148. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 726. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 522. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 521. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1216 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 564.
HSB234 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 759.
HF759 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 965.
HSB234 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 759.
HF759 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 965.