IA SF558 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations involving state government entities associated with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection. (Formerly SSB 1210.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations involving state government entities associated with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection. (Formerly SSB 1210.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Shall amendment H–1336 be adopted? (Y: 34 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-05-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Shall amendment H–1336 be adopted? (Y: 34 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3180 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3180 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3180 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3180 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Shall amendment H–1336 be adopted? (Y: 34 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3180 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3180 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3180 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3180 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1035. |
2023-05-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 977. |
2023-05-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1014. |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed House, yeas 62, nays 33. H.J. 968. |
2023-05-02 | House | Point of order raised on amendment H-1335, ruled not germane. H.J. 968. |
2023-05-02 | House | Amendment H-1335 filed. H.J. 968. |
2023-05-02 | House | Amendment H-1328 withdrawn. H.J. 968. |
2023-05-02 | House | Amendment H-1336, yeas 34, nays 61, filed, lost. H.J. 967. |
2023-05-02 | House | Unanimous consent for immediate consideration. H.J. 957. |
2023-04-27 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2023-05-01 | House | Amendment H-1328 filed. H.J. 954. |
2023-04-27 | House | NOBA: House Sub |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 917. |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 917. |
2023-04-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2023-04-26 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2023-04-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/27/2023 9:00AM House Lounge. |
2023-04-26 | House | Subcommittee: Mommsen, Bagniewski and Latham. H.J. 912. |
2023-04-26 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 911. |
2023-04-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 910. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 958. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 16. S.J. 958. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment S-3180 filed, adopted. S.J. 957. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 735. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 733. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1210 (Related) 2023-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 558.