IA SF557 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 119.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 119.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to noneconomic damage awards against health care providers.(Formerly SSB 1225.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to noneconomic damage awards against health care providers.(Formerly SSB 1225.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 119. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1148. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 726. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 525. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 520. |
Same As/Similar To
HF517 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 592.
HF592 (Similar To) 2021-05-20 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 1203.
SSB1225 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 557.
HF592 (Similar To) 2021-05-20 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 1203.
SSB1225 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 557.