IA SF555 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 891.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 891.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to weight limitations for certain implements of husbandry. (Formerly SSB 1217.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to weight limitations for certain implements of husbandry. (Formerly SSB 1217.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 891. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 891. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 742. |
2019-03-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 646. |
2019-03-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 73, nays 25. H.J. 643. |
2019-03-26 | House | Substituted for HF 699. H.J. 643. |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 602. |
2019-03-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 599. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 693. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 693. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 521. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 516. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB218 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 418.
SSB1217 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF699 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 647.
SSB1217 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF699 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 647.