IA SF551 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 938.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 938.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to fire fighters and emergency medical services members operating certain vehicles. (Formerly SF 503.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to fire fighters and emergency medical services members operating certain vehicles. (Formerly SF 503.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 938. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 938. |
2022-03-30 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 735. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 652. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 1. S.J. 650. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5089. S.J. 649. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5089. S.J. 625. |
2022-03-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 689. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 68, nays 25. H.J. 666. |
2022-03-24 | House | Amendment H-8040 adopted. H.J. 666. |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on calendar H.J. 303. |
2022-02-18 | House | Committee amendment H-8040 filed H.J. 303. |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 303. |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2022 8:15AM House Lounge 2. |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Bossman, Kressig and Worthan. H.J. 200. |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Bossman, Kressig and Worthan. H.J. 137. |
2021-05-20 | House | Rereferred to Transportation. H.J. 1203. |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 920. |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 879. |
2021-03-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/30/2021 8:00AM House Lounge 2. |
2021-03-24 | House | Subcommittee: Worthan, Bradley and Cohoon. H.J. 830. |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 761. |
2021-03-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 742. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 621. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 620. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3074 filed, adopted. S.J. 620. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 530. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 519. |
Same As/Similar To
SF503 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 551. S.J. 530.