IA SF540 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1077.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the temporary delegation of parental authority by the parent, guardian, or legal custodian of a child. (Formerly SF 360.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the temporary delegation of parental authority by the parent, guardian, or legal custodian of a child. (Formerly SF 360.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-27HouseRereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1077.
2019-04-16HouseAmendment H-1231 filed. H.J. 885.
2019-04-03HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 717.
2019-04-03HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 716.
2019-04-02SenateImmediate message. S.J. 836.
2019-04-02SenatePassed Senate, yeas 30, nays 16. S.J. 835.
2019-04-02SenateAmendment S-3107 adopted. S.J. 835.
2019-04-02SenateAmendment S-3099 out of order. S.J. 835.
2019-04-02SenateAmendment S-3108 to S-3107 lost. S.J. 834.
2019-04-01SenateAmendments S-3099, S-3107, and S-3108 filed. S.J. 819.
2019-03-07SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 507.
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 501.

Same As/Similar To

HSB134 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. H.J. 468.
SF360 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Reported out of committee as SF 540. S.J. 507.
HF721 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback