IA SF534 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 891.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the use of gasification and pyrolysis facilities for the conversion of certain recoverable waste materials. (Formerly SSB 1194.) Effective 7-1-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the use of gasification and pyrolysis facilities for the conversion of certain recoverable waste materials. (Formerly SSB 1194.) Effective 7-1-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 891.
2019-04-08SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 891.
2019-03-28SenateMessage from House. S.J. 793.
2019-03-28HouseImmediate message. H.J. 688.
2019-03-28HousePassed House, yeas 90, nays 6. H.J. 684.
2019-03-28HouseSubstituted for HF 683. H.J. 684.
2019-03-14HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 562.
2019-03-13HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 539.
2019-03-13HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 537.
2019-03-13SenateImmediate message. S.J. 606.
2019-03-13SenatePassed Senate, yeas 45, nays 3. S.J. 606.
2019-03-07SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 505.
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 500.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1194 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB220 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 403.
HF683 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 688.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback