IA SF534 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the application of certificate of need requirements to specialized outpatient surgical facilities, providing for fees, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1212.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the application of certificate of need requirements to specialized outpatient surgical facilities, providing for fees, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1212.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-06-10 | Message from House, with amendment S-3351. S.J. 1153. | |
2011-06-08 | Immediate message. H.J. 1249. | |
2011-06-08 | Passed House, ayes 54, nays 37. H.J. 1248. | |
2011-06-08 | Committee amendment H-1736 adopted. H.J. 1247. | |
2011-06-08 | Motion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 1247. | |
2011-06-08 | Motion to suspend rules to consider committee amendment H-1736. H.J. 1246. | |
2011-06-08 | Ruled not germane committee amendment H-1736. H.J. 1246. | |
2011-06-08 | Point of order raised committee amendment H-1736 not germane. H.J. 1246. | |
2011-06-07 | Rule 67, time certain, invoked for 2pm on 6/8/11. H.J. 1224. | |
2011-06-06 | Committee amendment H-1736 filed. H.J. 1223. | |
2011-06-06 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 1222. | |
2011-05-19 | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 1214. | |
2011-05-19 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1214. | |
2011-05-16 | Immediate message. S.J. 1138. | |
2011-05-16 | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23. S.J. 1138. | |
2011-05-16 | Amendment S-3347 filed, lost. S.J. 1137. | |
2011-05-16 | Amendment S-3344 filed, lost. S.J. 1136. | |
2011-05-16 | Point of order raised on S-3348, ruled out of order. S.J. 1136. | |
2011-05-16 | Amendment S-3348 filed. S.J. 1136. | |
2011-05-16 | Point of order raised on S-3346, ruled out of order. S.J. 1136. | |
2011-05-16 | Amendment S-3346 filed. S.J. 1136. | |
2011-05-16 | Point of order raised on S-3345, ruled out of order. S.J. 1136. | |
2011-05-16 | Amendment S-3345 filed. S.J. 1135. | |
2011-05-12 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1126. | |
2011-05-12 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 1125. |