IA SF529 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-12 - Subcommittee: Green, Bennett, and Cournoyer. S.J. 103.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-12 - Subcommittee: Green, Bennett, and Cournoyer. S.J. 103.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the reservation of designated equestrian campgrounds, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SF 366.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the reservation of designated equestrian campgrounds, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SF 366.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Green, Bennett, and Cournoyer. S.J. 103. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 1092. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 507. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 494. |
Same As/Similar To
SF366 (Similar To) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 529. S.J. 507.