IA SF527 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee reassigned: Dawson, Bolkcom, and Chapman. S.J. 69.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee reassigned: Dawson, Bolkcom, and Chapman. S.J. 69.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to evidence of title by state banks and credit unions for certain loans. (Formerly SF 313.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to evidence of title by state banks and credit unions for certain loans. (Formerly SF 313.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Dawson, Bolkcom, and Chapman. S.J. 69. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Commerce. S.J. 858. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 504. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 499. |
Same As/Similar To
SF313 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 527. S.J. 504.
HSB202 (Related) 2019-02-22 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2019 10:00AM House Lounge.
HSB202 (Related) 2019-02-22 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2019 10:00AM House Lounge.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF527 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF527.html |