IA SF526 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act creating a blue alert program within the department of public safety for the apprehension of a person suspected of killing or seriously injuring a peace officer in the line of duty or due to safety concerns for a peace officer missing while on duty. (Formerly SSB 1167.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act creating a blue alert program within the department of public safety for the apprehension of a person suspected of killing or seriously injuring a peace officer in the line of duty or due to safety concerns for a peace officer missing while on duty. (Formerly SSB 1167.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29SenateSigned by Governor.
2020-06-24SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
2020-06-12SenateMessage from House. S.J. 792.
2020-06-12HouseImmediate message. H.J. 722.
2020-06-12HousePassed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 722.
2020-03-05HousePlaced on calendar H.J. 514.
2020-03-05HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 514.
2020-02-26HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2020-02-25HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2020 2:30PM House Lounge.
2020-02-19HouseSubcommittee: Lohse, Klein and Olson. H.J. 307.
2019-04-27HouseRereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1077.
2019-04-11HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843.
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 740.
2019-03-28HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2019 12:30PM House Lounge.
2019-03-28HouseSubcommittee: Hinson, Derry and Mitchell. H.J. 690.
2019-03-28HouseRead first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 675.
2019-03-28HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 673.
2019-03-27SenateImmediate message. S.J. 770.
2019-03-27SenatePassed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 769.
2019-03-27SenateAmendment S-3081 filed, adopted. S.J. 769.
2019-03-07SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 510.
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 499.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1167 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee recommends passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback