IA SF524 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing an inpatient psychiatric bed tracking system study committee. (Formerly SSB 1227.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act establishing an inpatient psychiatric bed tracking system study committee. (Formerly SSB 1227.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Shall the motion to refuse to concur be adopted? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Shall the motion to refuse to concur be adopted? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1149. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1092. |
2021-05-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1151. |
2021-06-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1206. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1205. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1200. |
2021-05-18 | House | Passed House, yeas 90, nays none. H.J. 1145. |
2021-05-18 | House | House receded. H.J. 1144. |
2021-05-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1143. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1089. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Explanations of votes. S.J. 1110. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate refused to concur with S-3161. S.J. 1086. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3161. S.J. 902. |
2021-04-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 980. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1173. |
2021-04-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1000. |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays none. H.J. 974. |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee amendment H-1334 adopted. H.J. 973. |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 920. |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee amendment H-1334 filed. H.J. 879. |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 878. |
2021-03-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/18/2021 7:45AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2021-03-15 | House | Subcommittee: Andrews, Brown-Powers and Meyer, A.. H.J. 730. |
2021-03-11 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 706. |
2021-03-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 703. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 586. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 585. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 510. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 505. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1227 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 524.