IA SF524 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1077.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1077.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to sexual exploitation by a youth athletics coach and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 380.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to sexual exploitation by a youth athletics coach and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 380.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1077. |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843. |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 759. |
2019-04-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-04-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/02/2019 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2019-04-01 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Jones and Wolfe. H.J. 707. |
2019-03-29 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 693. |
2019-03-29 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 691. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 791. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 788. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3084 adopted. S.J. 788. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Amendment S-3084 filed. S.J. 779. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 509. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 498. |
Same As/Similar To
SF380 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 524. S.J. 509.