IA SF523 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the nonconsensual cause of death of and serious injury to an unborn person, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 1170.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the nonconsensual cause of death of and serious injury to an unborn person, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 1170.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-04-01HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2019 1:00PM House Lounge.
2019-03-28HouseSubcommittee: Hite, Holt and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 690.
2019-03-27HouseRead first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 664.
2019-03-27HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 655.
2019-03-26SenateImmediate message. S.J. 749.
2019-03-26SenatePassed Senate, yeas 31, nays 18. S.J. 749.
2019-03-26SenateAmendment S-3077 adopted. S.J. 748.
2019-03-26SenatePoint of order raised on S-3077, ruled in order. S.J. 748.
2019-03-26SenateAmendment S-3077 filed. S.J. 748.
2019-03-26SenateAmendment S-3073 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 747.
2019-03-11SenateFiscal note.
2019-03-07SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 509.
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 498.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1170 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback