IA SF522 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 3:30PM RM 22.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 3:30PM RM 22.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to grandparent and great-grandparent visitation. (Formerly SF 10.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to grandparent and great-grandparent visitation. (Formerly SF 10.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 3:30PM RM 22. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 121. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1191. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 509. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 498. |
Same As/Similar To
SF10 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 522. S.J. 509.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF522 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF522.html |