IA SF517 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1140.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1140.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the provision of academic credit, including social studies coursework, and exemptions for physical education and activity requirements for students who participate in the legislative page program at the state capitol. Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the provision of academic credit, including social studies coursework, and exemptions for physical education and activity requirements for students who participate in the legislative page program at the state capitol. Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Roby Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1140. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1140. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 841. |
2021-04-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 910. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1173. |
2021-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 996. |
2021-04-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 951. |
2021-04-07 | House | Passed House, yeas 82, nays 9. H.J. 910. |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 873. |
2021-03-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/31/2021 8:15AM House Lounge. |
2021-03-30 | House | Subcommittee: Brink, Cahill and Hite. H.J. 871. |
2021-03-30 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 870. |
2021-03-30 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 869. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 705. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 1. S.J. 702. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 527. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee of the whole recommends passage. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Boulton, and R. Smith. S.J. 498. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 495. |