IA SF516 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 726.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 726.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of automated or remote systems for traffic law enforcement, including prohibiting the sharing of related information, requiring the removal of existing systems, and providing exceptions, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 1176.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of automated or remote systems for traffic law enforcement, including prohibiting the sharing of related information, requiring the removal of existing systems, and providing exceptions, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 1176.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 726. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 500. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 495. |
Same As/Similar To
HF249 (Similar To) 2021-01-27 - Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 211.
SSB1176 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as [].
SSB1176 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as [].