IA SF513 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 896.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 896.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to persons experiencing a mental health crisis, substance-related disorder crisis, or housing crisis. (Formerly SF 395.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to persons experiencing a mental health crisis, substance-related disorder crisis, or housing crisis. (Formerly SF 395.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 896. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 896. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 712. |
2022-04-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 811. |
2022-05-23 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 901. |
2022-04-05 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 1. H.J. 785. |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 645. |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 588. |
2022-03-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 588. |
2022-03-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/15/2022 8:00AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2022-03-10 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Anderson and Wheeler. H.J. 543. |
2022-03-09 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 514. |
2022-03-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 512. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 478. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 476. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amendment S-5046 filed, adopted. S.J. 476. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 326. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2022 10:00AM Room G15. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and J. Taylor. S.J. 159. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 726. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 499. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 494. |
Same As/Similar To
SF395 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 513. S.J. 499.