IA SF509 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations involving state government entities involved with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection, and including effective date and retroactive and other applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1192.) Various effective dates; see sections 21, 26, 45, and 60 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations involving state government entities involved with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection, and including effective date and retroactive and other applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1192.) Various effective dates; see sections 21, 26, 45, and 60 of bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-07-21 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1266. | |
2011-06-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1266. | |
2011-06-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1266. | |
2011-06-27 | Message from House. S.J. 1226. | |
2011-06-27 | Immediate message. H.J. 1279. | |
2011-06-27 | Explanations of votes. H.J. 1290. | |
2011-06-27 | Passed House, ayes 54, nays 35. H.J. 1273. | |
2011-06-27 | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 1273. | |
2011-06-24 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1265. | |
2011-06-24 | Immediate message. S.J. 1213. | |
2011-06-24 | Passed Senate, ayes 34, nays 13. S.J. 1212. | |
2011-06-24 | Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 1212. | |
2011-06-24 | Conference committee report filed. S.J. 1212. | |
2011-06-24 | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 1263. | |
2011-06-23 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1260. | |
2011-06-22 | Message from House. S.J. 1199. | |
2011-06-22 | House conference committee appointed Hall, T. Olson, Drake, Paustian, and Alons. H.J. 1259. | |
2011-06-22 | Immediate message. S.J. 1190. | |
2011-06-22 | Senate conference committee appointed Black, Dearden, Hahn, Houser, and Wilhelm. S.J. 1189. | |
2011-06-22 | Senate insisted. S.J. 1188. | |
2011-06-22 | Message from House. S.J. 1187. | |
2011-06-22 | Immediate message. H.J. 1257. | |
2011-06-22 | House refused to concur in Senate amendment H-1743. H.J. 1256. | |
2011-06-22 | Senate amendment H-1743. H.J. 1256. | |
2011-06-22 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1254. | |
2011-06-21 | Immediate message. S.J. 1179. | |
2011-06-21 | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 21. S.J. 1178. | |
2011-06-21 | Senate concurred with S-3227, as amended. S.J. 1178. | |
2011-06-21 | Amendment S-3356 filed, adopted. S.J. 1177. | |
2011-04-11 | Message from House, with amendment S-3227. S.J. 941. | |
2011-04-07 | Immediate message. H.J. 983. | |
2011-04-07 | Passed House, ayes 58, nays 41. H.J. 966. | |
2011-04-07 | Amendments H-1596, H-1561, and H-1562 out of order. H.J. 965. | |
2011-04-07 | Committee amendment H-1457 out of order. H.J. 965. | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment H-1586 as amended, adopted. H.J. 965. | |
2011-04-07 | Ruled not germane H-1617. H.J. 965. | |
2011-04-07 | Point of order raised H-1617 not germane. H.J. 965. | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment H-1617 filed. H.J. 965. | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment H-1607 filed, lost. H.J. 965. | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment H-1612 adopted. H.J. 965. | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment H-1612 filed. H.J. 964. | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment H-1615 filed, lost. H.J. 964. | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment H-1604 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 964. | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment H-1608 filed, lost. H.J. 964. | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment H-1619 lost. H.J. 964. | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment H-1619 filed. H.J. 963. | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment H-1605 filed, lost. H.J. 963. | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment H-1616 filed, lost. H.J. 963. | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment H-1618 filed, lost. H.J. 963. | |
2011-04-06 | Amendments H-1586 and H-1596 filed. H.J. 954. | |
2011-04-06 | Amendments H-1561 and H-1562 filed. H.J. 953. | |
2011-03-24 | Committee amendment H-1457 filed. H.J. 808. | |
2011-03-24 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 806. | |
2011-03-22 | Subcommittee, Drake, Chambers, Cohoon, Dolecheck, Garrett, Gaskill, Hagenow, Hall, Heaton, Heddens, Huseman, Lukan, Murphy, T. Olson, Raecker, Rogers, Running-Marquardt, Schulte, Schultz, T. Taylor, Wagner, Watts, Wenthe, Winckler, and Worthan. H.J. 771. | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 747. | |
2011-03-21 | Message from Senate. H.J. 739. | |
2011-03-21 | Immediate message. S.J. 734. | |
2011-03-21 | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 21. S.J. 730. | |
2011-03-21 | Amendment S-3140 filed, adopted. S.J. 729. | |
2011-03-17 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 720. | |
2011-03-17 | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 719. |