IA SF506 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 635.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 635.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to health facilities and health services including licensing and the certificate of need process, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1117.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to health facilities and health services including licensing and the certificate of need process, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1117.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services Report (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health And Human Services Report (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services Report (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health And Human Services Report (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 635. |
2024-03-19 | House | Amendment H-8217 filed. H.J. 626. |
2024-03-18 | House | Committee amendment H-8210 filed. H.J. 608. |
2024-03-18 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 606. |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 606. |
2024-03-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-03-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2024 12:15PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2024-02-14 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Baeth and Moore, T. H.J. 268. |
2023-03-30 | House | Read first time, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 745. |
2023-03-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 729. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 676. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 29, nays 21. S.J. 676. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3092 adopted. S.J. 675. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3092 filed. S.J. 648. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 468. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 462. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1117 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 506.