IA SF501 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Zaun, Sinclair, and R. Taylor. S.J. 87.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Zaun, Sinclair, and R. Taylor. S.J. 87.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the medical cannabidiol Act. (Formerly SF 256.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the medical cannabidiol Act. (Formerly SF 256.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Sinclair, and R. Taylor. S.J. 87. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 858. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Fiscal note, revised. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 490. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 482. |
Same As/Similar To
SF256 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 501. S.J. 490.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF501 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF501.html |