IA SF491 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/17/2021 8:30AM RM 24A.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/17/2021 8:30AM RM 24A.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a new remote worker grant fund and program to be administered by the economic development authority and making appropriations.(Formerly SSB 1032.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a new remote worker grant fund and program to be administered by the economic development authority and making appropriations.(Formerly SSB 1032.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Labor And Business Relations Report (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/17/2021 8:30AM RM 24A. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Guth, Dotzler, and Lofgren. S.J. 569. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 532. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 487. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 481. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1032 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 491.