IA SF473 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 525. S.J. 511.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to child welfare including the temporary custody of a child and judicial proceedings in child in need of assistance and termination of parental rights cases.(See SF 525.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to child welfare including the temporary custody of a child and judicial proceedings in child in need of assistance and termination of parental rights cases.(See SF 525.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 525. S.J. 511.
2021-03-01SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-02-25SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2021 4:30PM 217 Conference Room.
2021-03-01SenateSubcommittee: Edler, Costello, and Mathis. S.J. 484.
2021-02-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 466.

Same As/Similar To

SF525 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 726.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback