IA SF471 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the review of administrative rules and application processes. (Formerly SF 179.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the review of administrative rules and application processes. (Formerly SF 179.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to State Government. H.J. 1160. | |
2011-04-13 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2011-04-01 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 874. | |
2011-03-29 | Subcommittee, Iverson, Kajtazovic, and Rogers. H.J. 836. | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 775. | |
2011-03-22 | Message from Senate. H.J. 745. | |
2011-03-21 | Immediate message. S.J. 739. | |
2011-03-21 | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 2. S.J. 737. | |
2011-03-21 | Amendment S-3141 filed, adopted. S.J. 737. | |
2011-03-07 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 523. | |
2011-03-07 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 509. |