IA SF471 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to energy efficiency and renewable energy, including allocating appropriated amounts from the Iowa power fund to fund tax credits for innovative renewable energy generation components, transferring authority over specified energy-related measures and programs from the department of natural resources to the office of energy independence, providing transition provisions relating to the transfer of authority, and providing an effective date. (Formerly SSB 1262 and SF 373.) Effective 5-18-09.
Title
A bill for an act relating to energy efficiency and renewable energy, including allocating appropriated amounts from the Iowa power fund to fund tax credits for innovative renewable energy generation components, transferring authority over specified energy-related measures and programs from the department of natural resources to the office of energy independence, providing transition provisions relating to the transfer of authority, and providing an effective date. (Formerly SSB 1262 and SF 373.) Effective 5-18-09.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-05-18 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1282. | |
2009-04-26 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1279. | |
2009-04-26 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1279. | |
2009-04-25 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1966. | |
2009-04-25 | Immediate message. S.J. 1254. | |
2009-04-25 | Passed Senate, ayes 33, nays 16. S.J. 1253. | |
2009-04-25 | Senate concurred with S-3360. S.J. 1252. | |
2009-04-25 | Message from House, with amendment S-3360. S.J. 1251. | |
2009-04-25 | Immediate message. H.J. 1952. | |
2009-04-25 | Passed House, ayes 79, nays 16. H.J. 1951. | |
2009-04-25 | Amendment H-1728 adopted. H.J. 1951. | |
2009-04-25 | Amendment H-1728 filed. H.J. 1950. | |
2009-04-25 | Committee amendment H-1657 adopted. H.J. 1950. | |
2009-04-22 | Committee amendment H-1657 filed. H.J. 1629. | |
2009-04-22 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 1629. | |
2009-04-20 | Subcommittee, Petersen, Helland, and D. Olson. H.J. 1602. | |
2009-04-16 | Pursuant to Rule 31, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 1528. | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report recommending passage. H.J. 1528. | |
2009-04-14 | Subcommittee, Reichert, Jacoby, and Watts. H.J. 1449. | |
2009-04-13 | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 1378. | |
2009-04-13 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1364. | |
2009-04-13 | Immediate message. S.J. 1064. | |
2009-04-13 | Passed Senate, ayes 33, nays 17. S.J. 1064. | |
2009-04-13 | Amendment S-3194 adopted. S.J. 1063. | |
2009-04-13 | Amendment S-3238 filed, adopted. S.J. 1063. | |
2009-04-10 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 1058. | |
2009-04-06 | Amendment S-3194 filed. S.J. 979. | |
2009-04-06 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 955. | |
2009-04-06 | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 955. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0514B&ga=83 |