IA SF469 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 748.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 748.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to oversight of public assistance programs, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1157.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to oversight of public assistance programs, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1157.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 748. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | HF 531 substituted. S.J. 747. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 531. S.J. 685. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 509. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 504. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1157 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF469 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF469.html |